TDT1 Task 3

  Copy


More Options: Make a Folding Card




Storyboard Description

This storyboard does not have a description.

Storyboard Text

  • Today, we will learn how to multiply three digit numbers by two digit numbers.
  • The first step is to multiple the number on the second row, last number. I multiply this by the number on top of it. So this would be 4x3=12. I will write the number in the ones place first and bring the tens place number on top of the tens place number up top. I will continue to multiply the 3, the last number in the bottom row 3x3 and add the 1 that I had to carry over so my answer is 10. I will write 0 in the tens place, carry the 1 so that I will multiply 3x5+1 and write my product of 16 down to finish the row.
  • 11 534 x23 1602
  • Now, I will add a place holder 0 to show that I am on the second row. Then I will continue to multiply by moving to the tens place on the second row of multiplication and repeat the steps with 2x4, 2x3 and add 1, and 2x5. I write my products starting on the left of the 0 and move to the left.
  • 11 534 x 23 1602 10680
  • Now I will need to add my multiplication rows together.
  • 1 534 x 23 1602 +10680
  • I will add from the right and move to the left, writing my sums right to left as well. So, 2+0=2, 0+8=8, 6+6=12, I will write 2 in the tens place and carry the 1 to my hundreds number to add, just like we did for the multiplication part.
  • 1 534 x 23 1 1602 + 10680 282
  • Now I will add 1+5+6 to get 12, 2 goes into the hundreds place, 1 from the 12 goes on top of the 1 here and I add 1+1+0=2, and the 0+1=1. Final product is 12,272.
  • 1 534 x 23 1 1602 + 10680 122 8 2
Just Created with Storyboard That
Explore Our Articles and Examples

Try Our Other Websites!

Photos for Class – Search for School-Safe, Creative Commons Photos (It Even Cites for You!)
Quick Rubric – Easily Make and Share Great-Looking Rubrics