Questions About Remote Learning? Click Here

How to do Multiplication and Division of 5-6 digits by 2-3 digits
Updated: 9/3/2020
How to do Multiplication and Division of 5-6 digits by 2-3 digits
This storyboard was created with StoryboardThat.com

Storyboard Text

  • Good morning class, today we will learn Multiplication and Division of 5-6 digit numbers by 2-3 digit numbers.
  • Multiplication and Division of 5-6 digits by 2-3 digits
  • Okay!
  • So I will first show you how to do Multiplication of 5-6 digit by 2-3 digit: for example, let's say the problem is 24653 x 347.
  • First, you multiply 24653 by 7.Then you multiply 24653 by 4 and add a 0 at the end.Next, you multiply 24653 by 3 and add 2 0's.Lastly, add the answers and you get the answer: 8554591!If you want to multiply it by a 2-digit number instead, follow the same steps but only multiply the 2 digits.
  • 24653x 347 172571 986120+7395900 8554591
  • Okay class, Ihave taughtyou how to doMultiplicationof 5-6 digit by2-3 digit andnow I willteach you howto doLong Divisionof 5-6 digitsby 2-3 digits
  • Long Division of 5-6 digits by 2-3 digits
  • Okay!
  • First, you calculate how many times 121 would fit in the first three digits (160) and then find the remainder.Next bring down the next digit to the remainder and again calculate how many times 121 would fit in it. Repeat this until there are no numbers left.Combine the answers to get the answer: 1324!If you want to divide it by a 2-digit number instead, follow the same steps but only divide the 2 digits.
  • So now I will show you how to do Long Division of 5-6 digit by 2-3 digit: for example, let's say the problem is 160204 ÷ 121.
  • 1324121)160204 -121↓ 392 -363↓ 290 -242↓ 484 -484
  • Now solve these questions.
  • 34966 x 23635789 x 67577899 x 569646999 x 43Click To Edit12354 x 3245278HelpEscapeInsert ParagraphUndo the last commandRedo the last commandTabUntabSet a bold styleSet a italic styleSet a underline styleSet a strikethrough styleClean a styleSet left alignSet center alignSet right alignSet full alignToggle unordered listToggle ordered listOutdent on current paragraphIndent on current paragraphChange current block's format as a paragraph(P tag)Change current block's format as H1Change current block's format as H2Change current block's format as H3Change current block's format as H4Change current block's format as H5Change current block's format as H6Insert horizontal ruleShow Link DialogSummernote 0.8.18 · Project · Issues
  • Okay!
  • 213122 ÷ 9110080 ÷ 22418130 ÷ 74494716 ÷ 674
  • I got them all wrong.
  • I got them all correct!
  • Once you're done, check your answers with this answer sheet.
  • I got them half correct!
  • I got them half wrong.
  • Division 2342 45 245 674
  • Multiplication 8251976 2397863 328824531 27820957
Over 14 Million Storyboards Created
Storyboard That Family